OK HB3384 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; creating the Oklahoma Workplace Clean Air Act; effective date.
Title
Public health; creating the Oklahoma Workplace Clean Air Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 30 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 73 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-11 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wright |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 64 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |