OK HB3446 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; literacy specialists; funding; placement; training; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; literacy specialists; funding; placement; training; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Kelly Albright [D] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Chelsey Branham [D] | Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Albright |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad), Branham, Hill |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Baker |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |