OK HB3766 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; clarifying which medications are subject to electronic prescription requirements; effective date.
Title
Public health; Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; clarifying which medications are subject to electronic prescription requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-03-02 | House | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Marti |
2020-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |