OK HB3851 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Militia; providing for military magistrates; qualifications; emergency.
Title
Militia; providing for military magistrates; qualifications; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |