OK HB3921 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - coauthored by Fugate
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - coauthored by Fugate
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; insurance premium tax credit; entertainment industry expenditures; definitions; renaming Compete with Canada Film Act.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; insurance premium tax credit; entertainment industry expenditures; definitions; renaming Compete with Canada Film Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | coauthored by Fugate |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 28; Ayes: 67 Nays: 28 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Dunnington |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |