OK HB3967 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State contracts; declaring Israel a prominent trading partner; prohibiting state contracts without certain written certification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State contracts; declaring Israel a prominent trading partner; prohibiting state contracts without certain written certification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2020
2020-05-15HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
2020-05-15SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-05-15SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-05-15SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-15SenateWithdrawn from General Government committee
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Taylor
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Townley
2020-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 20
2020-03-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Boles, West (Tammy), Mize, Sneed, Hill, McDugle, Russ, Roberts (Sean), Randleman, Stark, Manger, West (Kevin)
2020-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-19HouseAuthored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
2020-02-19HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Hardin (David)
2020-02-19HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative McBride, Echols
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback