OK HB3968 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Endowed chair program; bonds; Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; effective date; emergency.
Title
Endowed chair program; bonds; Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Albright, Hasenbeck |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |