OK HB4019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Environmental Quality; directing submission of application; directing sale of certain building and appurtenances; effective date.
Title
Department of Environmental Quality; directing submission of application; directing sale of certain building and appurtenances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Energy committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 22 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey) |
2020-03-10 | House | Considered |
2020-03-09 | House | Laid over |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |