OK HCR1002 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Removed from Consent Docket
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Removed from Consent Docket
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Primary care; creating the Oklahoma Primary Care Improvement Task Force; emergency.
Title
Primary care; creating the Oklahoma Primary Care Improvement Task Force; emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Removed from Consent Docket |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid over |
2013-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Blackwell, Renegar |
2013-03-13 | House | Considered |
2013-03-11 | House | Published on Consent Docket |
2013-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hcr1002&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/HB/HCR1002_int.rtf |