OK HJR1132 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-07 - Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Construction Industries Board; distribution.
Title
Approving permanent rules of the Oklahoma Construction Industries Board; distribution.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-05-25 | SA's received | |
2012-05-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12 | |
2012-05-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-05-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-05-18 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-05-17 | First Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-16 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Williams | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 37 | |
2012-05-16 | General Order | |
2012-05-14 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-14 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-05-09 | Authored by Representative Banz | |
2012-05-09 | First Reading |