OK SB1001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1001
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; defining auxiliary container; restricting issuance of certain ordinance relating to containers.
Title
Environment and natural resources; defining auxiliary container; restricting issuance of certain ordinance relating to containers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 41; Ayes: 62 Nays: 30 |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-03-28 | House | Remove Representative Kerbs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1001 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019