OK SB1030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; setting forth provisions related to municipalities and employment; providing for revocation of medical marijuana license; prohibiting smoking of marijuana in certain areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; setting forth provisions related to municipalities and employment; providing for revocation of medical marijuana license; prohibiting smoking of marijuana in certain areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 2 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateApproved by Governor 05/29/2019
2019-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-23HouseTo Senate
2019-05-23HouseMotion to reconsider failed: Ayes: 2 Nays: 67
2019-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 7
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-21SenateCCR read
2019-05-15HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-15SenateSCs named Paxton, Smalley, Daniels, Simpson, Ikley-Freeman, Young
2019-05-15SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 10
2019-04-25HouseTitle restored
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseConsidered
2019-04-25HouseLaid over
2019-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Paxton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1030&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB1030%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1030%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB1030%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB1030%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1030%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB1030%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1030%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB1030%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB1030%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1030_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1030_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback