OK SB1046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1046
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Vetoed 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Vetoed 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental Hospital Offset Payment Program; fixing certain rate for specified fiscal year; modifying certain transfer authority; modifying allowable expenses. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Supplemental Hospital Offset Payment Program; fixing certain rate for specified fiscal year; modifying certain transfer authority; modifying allowable expenses. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Vetoed 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 38; Ayes: 70 Nays: 20 |
2020-05-15 | House | JCR adopted |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-05-14 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2020-05-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-03-25 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1046 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget