OK SB1059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ad valorem tax; clarifying language, procedures and terminology; conforming language to constitutional provision. Effective date.
Title
Ad valorem tax; clarifying language, procedures and terminology; conforming language to constitutional provision. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 15 |
2018-04-18 | House | General Order |
2018-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |