OK SB1074 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Licensing Act; updating various licensure provisions. Emergency.
Title
Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology Licensing Act; updating various licensure provisions. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amended |
2018-04-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn (Mike) |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Emergency added |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |