OK SB1086 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion to suspend rule failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion to suspend rule failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; limiting time period during which certain capital gains may be deducted. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; limiting time period during which certain capital gains may be deducted. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-19 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-05 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-03 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-02 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-03-22 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 10 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sears (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |