OK SB1098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Classification of felony crimes; creating the Criminal Justice Reclassification Coordination Council.
Title
Classification of felony crimes; creating the Criminal Justice Reclassification Coordination Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Rande Worthen [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Motion expired |
2018-05-03 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Worthen |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 31; Ayes: 51 Nays: 31 |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-01 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Matthews, Floyd |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14 |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-04-16 | House | Emergency added |
2018-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |