OK SB1105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime and punishment; modifying penalty for domestic assault. Effective date.
Title
Crime and punishment; modifying penalty for domestic assault. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |