OK SB1126 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - Motion to reconsider failed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-24 - Motion to reconsider failed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Appropriations; Tax rebates; relating to the Compete With Canada Film Act; rebate percentage; termination date. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Appropriations; Tax rebates; relating to the Compete With Canada Film Act; rebate percentage; termination date. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] |
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 38 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 47 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 26 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2013-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 42 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 47 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 26 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2013-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 42 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider failed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 45 |
2013-05-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears |
2013-05-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 44 |
2013-05-23 | House | Ayes: 42 Nays: 41 |
2013-05-23 | House | JCR adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | General Order |
2013-05-21 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2013-05-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2013-05-15 | Senate | coauthored by Dorman |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Emergency added |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2013-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Newell |
2013-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Justice |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |