OK SB1128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; providing limits on practitioners when issuing initial prescriptions for opioid drugs; continuous opioid prescription requirements; exceptions. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; providing limits on practitioners when issuing initial prescriptions for opioid drugs; continuous opioid prescription requirements; exceptions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Vetoed 05/11/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amended |
2018-04-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-16 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Derby (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 316 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |