OK SB1150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School employees; requiring school employees to report certain behavior; requiring school employees to report certain belief of abuse or neglect. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School employees; requiring school employees to report certain behavior; requiring school employees to report certain belief of abuse or neglect. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/11/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rescind naming of conferees |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rescind rejection of HAs |
2018-05-02 | House | Granting of conference rescinded |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reading of CCR rescinded |
2018-05-02 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Taylor and substitute with Representative Russ |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-01 | Senate | SCs changed David, Smalley to Daniels, Standridge |
2018-04-30 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-27 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Sykes, Dahm, David, Smalley, Brooks, Floyd |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Downing |
2018-04-16 | House | Remove Representative Downing as principal House author and substitute with Representative Taylor |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Downing (principal House author) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |