OK SB1203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School funding; directing student attendance of a charter school be considered separate from a sponsor. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School funding; directing student attendance of a charter school be considered separate from a sponsor. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |