OK SB1206 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Capitol Building; authorizing licensed vendors to contract for supplementary catering services during certain time period. Emergency.
Title
State Capitol Building; authorizing licensed vendors to contract for supplementary catering services during certain time period. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/24/2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-17 | House | Amended |
2014-04-17 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-04-17 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | Do Pass, pursuant to Discharge Petition |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Accountability |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Hulbert (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Loveless |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |