OK SB1221 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Alyssa Wiles Juvenile Life without Parole Sentencing Act; training and qualifications of the Pardon and Parole Board; annual training.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Alyssa Wiles Juvenile Life without Parole Sentencing Act; training and qualifications of the Pardon and Parole Board; annual training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Vetoed 05/11/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | coauthored by Wright |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Remove Senator Leewright as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Sykes |
2018-04-25 | House | Motion expired |
2018-04-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative West (Josh) |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31; Ayes: 60 Nays: 31 |
2018-04-23 | House | Emergency added |
2018-04-23 | House | Ayes: 53 Nays: 35 |
2018-04-23 | House | Amended |
2018-04-23 | House | General Order |
2018-04-12 | House | Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Josh) |
2018-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |