OK SB1232 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; modifying provisions relating to special license plates. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; modifying provisions relating to special license plates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-09 | HAs read | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-05 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-08 | coauthored by Dank (principal House author) | |
2012-02-08 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-08 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |