OK SB1242 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Space Industry Development Authority; designating the spaceport as the official State of Oklahoma Electrification of Air Transport Testing Facility. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Space Industry Development Authority; designating the spaceport as the official State of Oklahoma Electrification of Air Transport Testing Facility. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |