OK SB1274 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic data; prohibiting obtaining certain data without a search warrant. Effective date.
Title
Electronic data; prohibiting obtaining certain data without a search warrant. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |