OK SB1320 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Memorial highway designations; designating various memorial highways. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Memorial highway designations; designating various memorial highways. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Conference Committee on General Government: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Approved by Governor 05/29/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | To Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-24 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Eason McIntyre | |
2012-05-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Condit, Cannaday | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-23 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-23 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | coauthored by Simpson | |
2012-05-21 | CCR read | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation | |
2012-05-07 | SCs named Brinkley, Stanislawski, Simpson, Brecheen, Garrison, Ivester | |
2012-05-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Simpson | |
2012-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-12 | HAs read | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | |
2012-04-11 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-04-11 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Proctor, Williams | |
2012-04-11 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-02-16 | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) | |
2012-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brinkley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 134 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |