OK SB1321 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/05/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/05/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation fraud; authorizing contracts with retired police officers for certain investigative services. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation fraud; authorizing contracts with retired police officers for certain investigative services. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Approved by Governor 04/05/2012 | |
2012-04-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-03-29 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-03-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 | |
2012-03-29 | General Order | |
2012-03-26 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brinkley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |