OK SB1329 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Building codes; exempting certain church activities from occupancy ratings and codes. Effective date.
Title
Building codes; exempting certain church activities from occupancy ratings and codes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 21 |
2016-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-17 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson |
2016-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2016-05-09 | Senate | SCs named Ford, Newberry, Bice, Halligan, Dahm, Pittman, Wyrick |
2016-04-28 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | House | Motion expired |
2016-04-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dunlap |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 42 |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-04-07 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Strohm |
2016-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-04-04 | House | Withdrawn from Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Dunlap (principal House author) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1000 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 317 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 319 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 324 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |