OK SB1336 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Petroleum Storage Tank Indemnity Fund; extending fund termination date.
Title
Petroleum Storage Tank Indemnity Fund; extending fund termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Motion expired | |
2012-05-23 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Shannon | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3; Ayes: 61 Nays: 25 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-18 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-18 | Title restored | |
2012-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-01 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2012-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Branan | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |