OK SB1338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; brewer licenses; allowing for purchase of wine for on-premises sales; winemaker licenses; allowing for purchase of beer for on-premises sales. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; brewer licenses; allowing for purchase of wine for on-premises sales; winemaker licenses; allowing for purchase of beer for on-premises sales. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 18 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amended |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37A | 3 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |