OK SB1380 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Subject matter standards; modifying the curriculum requirements for graduation. Effective date.
Title
Subject matter standards; modifying the curriculum requirements for graduation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-24 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2016-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-18 | House | Emergency not considered |
2016-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-18 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-18 | House | Amended |
2016-04-18 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-08 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan (principal House author) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |