OK SB1438 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constructions Industries Board; removing prohibition of violations or fines; Mechanical Licensing Act; exception for certain gas pipelines.
Title
Constructions Industries Board; removing prohibition of violations or fines; Mechanical Licensing Act; exception for certain gas pipelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/04/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 11; Ayes: 63 Nays: 20 |
2014-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-14 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Newberry, Treat, Brinkley, Brecheen, Shumate, Sparks |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 |
2014-04-14 | House | General Order |
2014-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1000 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1850 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |