OK SB1457 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife; making Almighty God the owner of all wildlife in the state. Effective date.
Title
Wildlife; making Almighty God the owner of all wildlife in the state. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1457&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1457%20INT.PDF |