OK SB147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Common Education, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Common Education, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student transfers; requiring districts to submit certain credit deficiency information to the State Board of Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Student transfers; requiring districts to submit certain credit deficiency information to the State Board of Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Common Education, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB147 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Common Education