OK SB1577 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gross production tax exemption; limiting production eligible for economically at-risk oil or gas leases. Emergency.
Title
Gross production tax exemption; limiting production eligible for economically at-risk oil or gas leases. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 44 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 19 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 29 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 44 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 19 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 44 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-05-23 | Senate | coauthored by McBride |
2016-05-20 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-05-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-05-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2; Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 |
2016-05-19 | House | Amended |
2016-05-19 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-05-19 | House | Considered |
2016-05-19 | House | Laid over |
2016-05-19 | House | Ayes: 62 Nays: 31 |
2016-05-19 | House | Amended |
2016-05-19 | House | General Order |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2016-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Mazzei |
2016-05-12 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2016-05-02 | Senate | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2016-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |