OK SB1592 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; relating to information to be kept confidential by employer; exempting from confidentiality certain release of information to economic and business centers. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Labor; relating to information to be kept confidential by employer; exempting from confidentiality certain release of information to economic and business centers. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-20 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR read | |
2010-04-27 | Conference granted, HC's named Wright (Harold), Thomsen, Fields, McDaniel (Randy), Denney, Sears, Dorman, Walker, Morgan | |
2010-04-19 | SCs named Schulz, Coates, Johnson (Mike), Myers, Burrage | |
2010-04-14 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-13 | HAs read | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 | |
2010-04-12 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-12 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Wright (Harold) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Wright (Harold) | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-09 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 4 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 464 | New Code | See Bill Text |