OK SB1602 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agency director qualifications; modifying qualifications for certain positions. Effective date.
Title
Agency director qualifications; modifying qualifications for certain positions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 43 |
2016-05-25 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 52 Nays: 38 |
2016-05-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 48 |
2016-05-23 | House | JCR adopted |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered |
2016-05-20 | House | Laid over |
2016-05-20 | House | General Order |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2016-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Casey |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-05-11 | Senate | First Reading |