OK SB1604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; limiting time period during which certain credit is refundable. Effective date
Title
Income tax credits; limiting time period during which certain credit is refundable. Effective date
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] |
Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: ADVANCE THE QUESTION (Y: 21 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: ADVANCE THE QUESTION (Y: 21 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/27/2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion expired |
2016-05-19 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCullough |
2016-05-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 45 |
2016-05-19 | House | JCR adopted |
2016-05-19 | House | General Order |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2016-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-12 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Casey |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-05-11 | Senate | First Reading |