OK SB1617 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring a plan for compliance; requiring report. Effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring a plan for compliance; requiring report. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 47 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 33; Ayes: 47 Nays: 44 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-17 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-12 | CCR read | |
2010-04-27 | Conference granted, HC's named Denney, Kern, Coody, Cooksey, Nations, McDaniel (Jeannie), Hilliard | |
2010-04-20 | SCs named Halligan, Ford, Jolley, Paddack | |
2010-04-20 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-05 | HAs read | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Amended | |
2010-04-01 | General Order | |
2010-03-25 | Title restored | |
2010-03-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2010-03-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Denney | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Halligan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 541 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 544 | New Code | See Bill Text |