OK SB1713 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of residential building design elements; prohibiting certain city and county actions. Emergency.
Title
Regulation of residential building design elements; prohibiting certain city and county actions. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 31; Ayes: 68 Nays: 17 |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |