OK SB1756 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial bridge designations; designating the Bud Martin Memorial Bridge. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Memorial bridge designations; designating the Bud Martin Memorial Bridge. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brooks |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Thompson |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Howard |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Murdock; authored by Senator Standridge |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |