OK SB1788 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Veterinary Practice Act; changing veterinary technician to veterinary nurse; changing qualifications. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Veterinary Practice Act; changing veterinary technician to veterinary nurse; changing qualifications. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |