OK SB1805 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Vetoed 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Vetoed 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private education; modifying duties and fees of the Oklahoma Board of Private Vocational Schools. Emergency.
Title
Private education; modifying duties and fees of the Oklahoma Board of Private Vocational Schools. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Vetoed 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 5 |
2020-05-12 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dugger |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |