OK SB1829 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reinsurance; requirements for allowance of credit for reinsurance; authorizing certain credit; requiring Insurance Commissioner to create and publish certain lists related to reinsurance. Effective date.
Title
Reinsurance; requirements for allowance of credit for reinsurance; authorizing certain credit; requiring Insurance Commissioner to create and publish certain lists related to reinsurance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |