OK SB185 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB185
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Parole of Aging Prisoners Act. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Parole of Aging Prisoners Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] |
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson |
2018-05-03 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2018-04-27 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-27 | Senate | coauthored by Loring |
2018-04-27 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Loring and substitute with Representative West (Josh) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | SCs named Floyd, Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Matthews |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shaw |
2017-05-11 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Babinec and substitute with Representative Loring |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Floyd, Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Matthews |
2017-05-02 | Senate | coauthored by Goodwin |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 14 |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | Title stricken |
2017-04-05 | House | Remove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 332 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |