OK SB1851 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to inspect and license farmer's markets in Oklahoma and Tulsa Counties. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to inspect and license farmer's markets in Oklahoma and Tulsa Counties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2014-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-14 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Wildlife |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Justice, Fields, Shaw, Garrison, Simpson, Wyrick |
2014-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Billy |
2014-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2014-04-14 | House | Amended |
2014-04-14 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney |
2014-04-14 | House | General Order |
2014-03-27 | House | Title restored |
2014-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 5 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1118 | New Code | See Bill Text |