OK SB1862 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to charter schools; modifying allowed sponsorship; modify procedures. Effective date.
Title
Schools; relating to charter schools; modifying allowed sponsorship; modify procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] |
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 05/28/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 42 | |
2010-05-25 | Ayes: 48 Nays: 39 | |
2010-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14 | |
2010-05-25 | coauthored by Eason McIntyre | |
2010-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | coauthored by Ford | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-24 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-24 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-20 | Title restored | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read | |
2010-05-05 | SCs named Coffee, Ford, Jolley, Lamb, Laster | |
2010-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Denney, Sears, Coody, Shumate, Brannon | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 35 | |
2010-04-21 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2010-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 130 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |