OK SB1881 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to Oklahoma Department of Commerce; requiring website dedicated to Department's Boomerang program. Effective date.
Title
State government; relating to Oklahoma Department of Commerce; requiring website dedicated to Department's Boomerang program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Corn [D] | Sen. Todd Lamb [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in GCCA | |
2010-04-27 | Conference granted, HC's named McNiel, Denney, Jordan, Trebilcock, Wright (Harold), Kouplen, Scott | |
2010-04-19 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-13 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-13 | HAs read | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 24; Ayes: 52 Nays: 43 | |
2010-04-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2010-04-12 | General Order | |
2010-03-24 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-24 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Corn | |
2010-02-22 | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) McNiel | |
2010-02-18 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Corn | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-08 | Pending removal author Senator Bingman and replace with Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 5003 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5086 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |